ID SJR105 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SCHOOL ATTENDANCE -- Proposes an amendment to the state constitution to include private and home schooling in the compulsory attendance provision.
Title
Proposes an amendment to the state constitution to include private and home schooling in the compulsory attendance provision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |