ID SJR103 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Idaho relating to the sale of university lands to provide that no university lands shall be sold for less than the appraised price, rather than for less than ten dollars per acre; and to delete a restriction prohibiting the sale of more than one hundred and sixty acres of university lands, to any one person, company or corporation.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Idaho relating to the sale of university lands to provide that no university lands shall be sold for less than the appraised price, rather than for less than ten dollars per acre; and to delete a restriction prohibiting the sale of more than one hundred and sixty acres of university lands, to any one person, company or corporation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-24 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-24 | House intro | |
2010-03-23 | to House | |
2010-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-3-0 | |
2010-03-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-19 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-19 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-19 | to printing | |
2010-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-19 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/SJR103.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/SJR103.pdf |