ID SJM102 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and calling upon the President, the Secretary of Agriculture and Congress to give Idaho the flexibility to prohibit the purchase of unhealthy food items with Supplemental Nutritional Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits and to encourage healthy eating and lifestyle choices.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and calling upon the President, the Secretary of Agriculture and Congress to give Idaho the flexibility to prohibit the purchase of unhealthy food items with Supplemental Nutritional Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits and to encourage healthy eating and lifestyle choices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-25 | House | Read First Time, Held at Desk |
2013-03-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-22 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read in full |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/SJM102.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/SJM102.pdf |