ID SJM101 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATER -- Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the President and Congress to take such action as necessary to require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to recognize valid easements existing pursuant to the 1866 Mining Act on federal lands.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the President and Congress to take such action as necessary to require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to recognize valid easements existing pursuant to the 1866 Mining Act on federal lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2019-02-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/SJM101/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/SJM101.pdf |