ID SCR152 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION - RULE REJECTION - Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting certain rules of the Department of Administration relating to Rules Governing Capitol Mall Parking.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting certain rules of the Department of Administration relating to Rules Governing Capitol Mall Parking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-18 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Read in full |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/SCR152.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/SCR152.pdf |