ID SCR138 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOUNTAIN STANDARD TIME ZONE -- Urging that the people of the State of Idaho and its state and county officials carefully monitor the State of Washington's actions regarding its time zone and be prepared to consider requesting that the United States Department of Transportation include Idaho's northern ten counties consisting of Benewah, Bonner, Boundary, Clearwater, Idaho, Kootenai, Latah, Lewis, Nez Perce and Shoshone within the Mountain Standard Time Zone and exempt those counties from Daylight Savings Time.
Title
Urging that the people of the State of Idaho and its state and county officials carefully monitor the State of Washington's actions regarding its time zone and be prepared to consider requesting that the United States Department of Transportation include Idaho's northern ten counties consisting of Benewah, Bonner, Boundary, Clearwater, Idaho, Kootenai, Latah, Lewis, Nez Perce and Shoshone within the Mountain Standard Time Zone and exempt those counties from Daylight Savings Time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2018-03-12 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2018-03-01 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |