ID SCR137 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AQUIFERS - Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Idaho Water Resource Board address statewide aquifer stabilization and sustainability projects, including managed recharge.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Idaho Water Resource Board address statewide aquifer stabilization and sustainability projects, including managed recharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/23/16 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2016-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-17 | House | ADOPTED -- 68-1-1 |
2016-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 7, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2016-02-17 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-16 | Senate | ADOPTED -- 34-0-1 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read in full |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |