ID SCR128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RULE APPROVAL -- SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE -- States findings of the Legislature and approves pending rules of the Department of Health and Welfare reviewed by the Senate Health and Welfare Committee.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and approves pending rules of the Department of Health and Welfare reviewed by the Senate Health and Welfare Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2024-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2024-03-27 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 67-0-3 |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |