ID SCR125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - To Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - To Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge, with stated exceptions, and rejecting certain agency rules that are not approved.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge, with stated exceptions, and rejecting certain agency rules that are not approved.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | To Secretary of State | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-29 | to Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-29 | Loertscher | |
2010-03-29 | 65-0-5 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barrett, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Boe, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chavez, Chew, Clark, Collins, Cronin, Durst, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Jarvis, Killen, King, Kren, Labrador, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, Mathews, McGeachin, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Ruchti, Rusche, Sayler, Schaefer, Shepherd(02), Shepherd(08), Shirley, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Wills, Wood(27), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Crane, Moyle, Pasley-Stuart, Simpson, Wood(35) Floor Sponsor | |
2010-03-29 | ADOPTED | |
2010-03-29 | Rls susp | |
2010-03-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-26 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-26 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-26 | House intro | |
2010-03-25 | to House | |
2010-03-25 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-25 | McKenzie | |
2010-03-25 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2010-03-25 | ADOPTED | |
2010-03-25 | 10th Ord | |
2010-03-24 | to 10th Ord | |
2010-03-24 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-23 | to printing | |
2010-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-23 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/SCR125.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/SCR125.pdf |