ID SCR119 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VICTIMS OF COMMUNISM MEMORIAL DAY -- Stating findings of the Legislature and designating November 7 as Victims of Communism Memorial Day.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and designating November 7 as Victims of Communism Memorial Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2020-02-12 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-02-07 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2020-02-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | to House |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/SCR119/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/SCR119.pdf |