ID SCR116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
Pending: House Transportation and Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Provides authorization to the Joint Legislative Oversight Committee to authorize the Office of Performance Evaluations to hire a consultant to study highway district consolidation and to review the role of the Local Highway Technical Assistance Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides authorization to the Joint Legislative Oversight Committee to authorize the Office of Performance Evaluations to hire a consultant to study highway district consolidation and to review the role of the Local Highway Technical Assistance Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-26Senateto House
2019-03-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-26SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 20-14-1
2019-03-25SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-22SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback