ID SCR108 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FEDERAL BUDGET -- Stating findings of the Legislature and making a formal application to Congress to call a convention for the sole purpose of proposing for ratification an amendment to the Constitution which requires a balanced federal budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and making a formal application to Congress to call a convention for the sole purpose of proposing for ratification an amendment to the Constitution which requires a balanced federal budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01SenateFiled in Office of the Secretary of Senate
2017-03-01SenateRead in full -- FAILED 11-24-0
2017-02-27SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2017-02-16SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback