ID SCR107 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GENE HARRIS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing and honoring Gene Harris for his lifelong achievements as a celebrated jazz musician as well as his cultural and educational contributions to the State of Idaho.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing and honoring Gene Harris for his lifelong achievements as a celebrated jazz musician as well as his cultural and educational contributions to the State of Idaho.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2017-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 6, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/SCR107/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/SCR107.pdf |