ID SCR106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MINORU YASUI -- Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Minoru Yasui for his courage and his commitment to liberty and justice.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Minoru Yasui for his courage and his commitment to liberty and justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2017-02-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-02-17 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-17 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-17 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote -Webb |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/SCR106/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/SCR106.pdf |