ID S1441 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Recommitted to Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Recommitted to Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding school facilities funding.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding school facilities funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Recommitted to Education |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |