ID S1428 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation
Pending: House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation
Pending: House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXES -- Amends existing law to clarify that military retirement benefits are exempt regardless of the age or disability status of the retired military member or such member's widow or widower.
Title
Amends existing law to clarify that military retirement benefits are exempt regardless of the age or disability status of the retired military member or such member's widow or widower.
Sponsors
Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee | Sen. Ben Adams [R] | Rep. Ted Hill [R] | Sen. James Ruchti [D] |
Sen. Rick Just [D] | Sen. Todd Lakey [R] | Sen. Charles Winder [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2024-03-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 22-10-3 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |