ID S1422 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - PERMANENT BUILDING FUND - Appropriates an additional $2,897,000 for the Permanent Building Fund for fiscal year 2016; authorizes the allocation of funds for specific projects for fiscal year 2016; appropriates $26,729,700 from the Permanent Building Fund for fiscal year 2017; authorizes the allocation of funds for specific projects for fiscal year 2017; provides legislative intent relating to utilization of matching funds; exempts the appropriation from certain provisions; and provides legislative intent relating to reallocation of project savings.
Title
Appropriates an additional $2,897,000 for the Permanent Building Fund for fiscal year 2016; authorizes the allocation of funds for specific projects for fiscal year 2016; appropriates $26,729,700 from the Permanent Building Fund for fiscal year 2017; authorizes the allocation of funds for specific projects for fiscal year 2017; provides legislative intent relating to utilization of matching funds; exempts the appropriation from certain provisions; and provides legislative intent relating to reallocation of project savings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | All other sections |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 372 Effective: 04/05/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Monks |
2016-03-24 | House | 63-4-3 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Batt, Chaney, Scott, Sims Absent -- Bateman, Kloc, Rubel Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Lacey |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Anthon Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |