ID S1417 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION/STATE TAX COMMISSION/ INDUSTRIAL COMMISSION -- Amends existing law to increase the salaries of members of the Public Utilities Commission; to increase the salaries of members of the State Tax Commission; to increase the salaries of members of the Industrial Commission; appropriates an additional $20,800 to the Public Utilities Commission for commissioner salaries; appropriates an additional $25,700 to the State Tax Commission for commissioner salaries; and appropriates an additional $20,200 to the Industrial Commission for commissioner salaries.
Title
Amends existing law to increase the salaries of members of the Public Utilities Commission; to increase the salaries of members of the State Tax Commission; to increase the salaries of members of the Industrial Commission; appropriates an additional $20,800 to the Public Utilities Commission for commissioner salaries; appropriates an additional $25,700 to the State Tax Commission for commissioner salaries; and appropriates an additional $20,200 to the Industrial Commission for commissioner salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-24 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-23 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-23 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |