ID S1415 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 297 Effective: 04/03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 297 Effective: 04/03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates an additional $3,000 from the General Fund to the Council for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing in the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation for fiscal year 2012. Transfers $30,000 from the General Fund to the Council for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing from the Vocational Rehabilitation Program and the Renal Disease Services Program within the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation.
Title
Appropriates an additional $3,000 from the General Fund to the Council for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing in the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation for fiscal year 2012. Transfers $30,000 from the General Fund to the Council for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing from the Vocational Rehabilitation Program and the Renal Disease Services Program within the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 297 Effective: 04/03/12 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-29 | To enrol | |
2012-03-29 | to Senate | |
2012-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-29 | Ringo | |
2012-03-29 | 61-4-5 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, Moyle, Nesset, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, McMillan, Nielsen, Wood(35) Absent and excused -- Jaquet, McGeachin, Roberts, Smith(24), Trail Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-29 | PASSED | |
2012-03-29 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-28 | House intro | |
2012-03-28 | to House | |
2012-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-28 | Broadsword | |
2012-03-28 | 34-0-1 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Rice, Siddoway, Smyser, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Schmidt Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-28 | PASSED | |
2012-03-28 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-27 | to Fin | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-26 | to printing | |
2012-03-26 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-26 | Senate intro |