ID S1401 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- STATE TREASURER -- Relates to the appropriation to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2025.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2024-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2024-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2024-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-1-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |