ID S1378 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALARIES OF JUDGES -- Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding the salary of the justices of the Supreme Court.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding the salary of the justices of the Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |