ID S1376 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Session Law Chapter 268 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Session Law Chapter 268 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC OFFICIALS -- Amends existing law to provide an exception for certain public officials for the use of public property or resources while advocating for or against an initiative or referendum.
Title
Amends existing law to provide an exception for certain public officials for the use of public property or resources while advocating for or against an initiative or referendum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 268 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2024-03-26 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-12-3 |
2024-03-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 30-5-0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |