ID S1372 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 281 Effective: 03/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 281 Effective: 03/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide definitions, to provide for a responsible entity, to establish provisions relating to a data inventory and dictionary or index, to establish provisions relating to certain policies and procedures, to establish provisions relating to the State Board of Education and the State Department of Education ensuring that certain vendors shall comply with the law, to provide for a civil enforcement action, to provide for a court action, to provide for a penalty, to establish provisions relating to data deemed confidential, to provide for exceptions and to provide for a data security plan.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide definitions, to provide for a responsible entity, to establish provisions relating to a data inventory and dictionary or index, to establish provisions relating to certain policies and procedures, to establish provisions relating to the State Board of Education and the State Department of Education ensuring that certain vendors shall comply with the law, to provide for a civil enforcement action, to provide for a court action, to provide for a penalty, to establish provisions relating to data deemed confidential, to provide for exceptions and to provide for a data security plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 281 Effective: 03/26/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/20/14 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-17 | House | Horman |
2014-03-17 | House | 68-0-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Nielsen, Thompson Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-17 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-17 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 2, read three times |
2014-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Goedde |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-11 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |