ID S1360 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY -- Appropriates $66,620,100 to the Department of Environmental Quality for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 386.00; transfers $1.5 million from the Water Pollution Control Fund to the Environmental Remediation Basin Fund; provides legislative intent regarding the Environmental Remediation Basin Fund and requires an annual report; provides legislative intent regarding uses of the Water Pollution Control Fund; provides legislative intent regarding certain moneys appropriated for agricultural best management practices; and provides reappropriation authority for moneys associated with agricultural best management practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $66,620,100 to the Department of Environmental Quality for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 386.00; transfers $1.5 million from the Water Pollution Control Fund to the Environmental Remediation Basin Fund; provides legislative intent regarding the Environmental Remediation Basin Fund and requires an annual report; provides legislative intent regarding uses of the Water Pollution Control Fund; provides legislative intent regarding certain moneys appropriated for agricultural best management practices; and provides reappropriation authority for moneys associated with agricultural best management practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateSession Law Chapter 293 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-21SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-20SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-20Houseto Senate
2018-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-12-2
2018-03-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-16HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-16HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-15Senateto House
2018-03-15SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-15SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-03-15SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-14SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback