ID S1360 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 273 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 273 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the appropriation to the Endowment Fund Investment Board for fiscal year 2012; amends legislative intent with regard to transfers from the earnings reserve funds to the income funds for fiscal year 2012; appropriates $607,600 to the Endowment Fund Investment Board for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 4; authorizes continuous appropriation authority for certain costs; expresses legislative intent with regard to transfers from the earnings reserve funds to the income funds; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Amends the appropriation to the Endowment Fund Investment Board for fiscal year 2012; amends legislative intent with regard to transfers from the earnings reserve funds to the income funds for fiscal year 2012; appropriates $607,600 to the Endowment Fund Investment Board for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 4; authorizes continuous appropriation authority for certain costs; expresses legislative intent with regard to transfers from the earnings reserve funds to the income funds; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 273 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-22 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-21 | To enrol | |
2012-03-20 | to Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-3-2 | |
2012-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-14 | House intro | |
2012-03-13 | to House | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-3 | |
2012-03-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | to Fin | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-29 | to printing | |
2012-02-29 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-29 | Senate intro |