ID S1358 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 04/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 04/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FETAL HEARTBEAT PREBORN CHILD PROTECTION ACT -- Amends S.B. 1309 and existing law to revise a provision regarding attorney's fees, to remove a provision regarding an affirmative defense, and to redesignate a section.
Title
Amends S.B. 1309 and existing law to revise a provision regarding attorney's fees, to remove a provision regarding an affirmative defense, and to redesignate a section.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 04/22/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 50-14-6 |
2022-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2022-03-04 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-6-1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |