ID S1348 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DEBTS OWED TO COURTS -- Amends existing law to establish provisions regarding collection of debts owed to a court.
Title
Amends existing law to establish provisions regarding collection of debts owed to a court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |