ID S1347 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - to Gen Ord
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - to Gen Ord
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to minimum wage to provide that Idaho minimum wage law exemptions shall conform to and track with federal minimum wage law exemptions; and to provide an exemption from application of minimum wage law to certain establishments, camps and educational conference centers.
Title
Amends existing law relating to minimum wage to provide that Idaho minimum wage law exemptions shall conform to and track with federal minimum wage law exemptions; and to provide an exemption from application of minimum wage law to certain establishments, camps and educational conference centers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | to Gen Ord | |
2010-03-25 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-17 | Ret'd to St Aff | |
2010-03-12 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-11 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-11 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-11 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-25 | to St Aff | |
2010-02-25 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-25 | House intro | |
2010-02-24 | to House | |
2010-02-24 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 29-6-0 | |
2010-02-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-19 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-19 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-19 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-15 | to Com/HuRes | |
2010-02-15 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-12 | to printing | |
2010-02-12 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-12 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1347.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1347.pdf |