ID S1342 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 276 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 276 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide for record augmentation on appeal and to provide for a superintendent or other designee's ongoing authority to place a certificated employee on involuntary leave.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for record augmentation on appeal and to provide for a superintendent or other designee's ongoing authority to place a certificated employee on involuntary leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 276 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/20/14 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-14 | House | PASSED -- 61-0-9 |
2014-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2014-02-20 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-19 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |