ID S1323 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 264 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 264 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to provide that a person's teaching certificate shall be revoked for the commission of certain crimes against adults and to provide an exception.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a person's teaching certificate shall be revoked for the commission of certain crimes against adults and to provide an exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 264 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2020-03-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 58-10-2 |
2020-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2020-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2020-03-02 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 24-10-1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |