ID S1314 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
Pending: House Transportation and Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to prohibit the use of certain electronic devices while driving a motor vehicle, to establish penalties, and to provide that Idaho law preempts local ordinances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to prohibit the use of certain electronic devices while driving a motor vehicle, to establish penalties, and to provide that Idaho law preempts local ordinances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2020-02-26HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-02-25Senateto House
2020-02-25SenateTitle apvd
2020-02-25SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 30-5-0
2020-02-24SenateRetained on calendar
2020-02-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback