ID S1312 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Child Protective Act to provide that the Department of Health and Welfare need not make reasonable efforts to prevent the placement of a child into foster care where a parent has committed an injury to a child that results in a serious or great bodily injury.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Child Protective Act to provide that the Department of Health and Welfare need not make reasonable efforts to prevent the placement of a child into foster care where a parent has committed an injury to a child that results in a serious or great bodily injury.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-25 | To Governor | |
2010-03-24 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-23 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-22 | To enrol | |
2010-03-19 | to Senate | |
2010-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 60-0-10 | |
2010-03-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-10 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-03 | to Jud | |
2010-03-03 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-03 | House intro | |
2010-03-02 | to House | |
2010-03-02 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-02 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2010-02-26 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-26 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-25 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-25 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-05 | to Jud | |
2010-02-05 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-04 | to printing | |
2010-02-04 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-04 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1312.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1312.pdf |