ID S1309 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 231 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 231 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ADOPTION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding allowable expenses for a birth mother.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding allowable expenses for a birth mother.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 231 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2024-03-26 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2024-03-25 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-25 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-03-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |