ID S1309 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 168 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 168 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
FIRE DISTRICTS -- Amends and repeals existing law to clarify that certain notice shall be required for temporary vacancy of a commissioner; to revise provisions regarding filling a vacancy; to provide a procedure if available seats on a fire protection board become vacant; and to authorize the Bureau of Emergency Medical Services to make grants to fire districts.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law to clarify that certain notice shall be required for temporary vacancy of a commissioner; to revise provisions regarding filling a vacancy; to provide a procedure if available seats on a fire protection board become vacant; and to authorize the Bureau of Emergency Medical Services to make grants to fire districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 168 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-1-5 |
2018-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Local Government |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2018-03-06 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |