ID S1305 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PSYCHOLOGISTS -- Adds to existing law to provide for Idaho's participation in the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact and to establish provisions regarding such compact.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for Idaho's participation in the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact and to establish provisions regarding such compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 44-20-6 |
2022-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-02 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2022-03-02 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 22-11-2 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |