ID S1301 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-26 - Recommitted to Local Government & Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-26 - Recommitted to Local Government & Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SELF-SERVICE STORAGE FACILITIES -- Amends existing law to provide for methods to assess self-service storage facility properties.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for methods to assess self-service storage facility properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-26 | Senate | Recommitted to Local Government & Taxation |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-17 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-03-14 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 22-12-1 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |