ID S1295 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - to Rev/Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - to Rev/Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to allow the State Tax Commission authority to investigate joining the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement.
Title
Adds to existing law to allow the State Tax Commission authority to investigate joining the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | to Rev/Tax | |
2010-03-03 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-03 | House intro | |
2010-03-02 | to House | |
2010-03-02 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-02 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-26 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-26 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-26 | Rpt out | |
2010-01-28 | to Loc Gov | |
2010-01-28 | Rpt prt | |
2010-01-27 | to printing | |
2010-01-27 | 1st rdg | |
2010-01-27 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1295.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1295.pdf |