ID S1290 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 227 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 227 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to establish the Rural and Underserved Educator Incentive Program.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the Rural and Underserved Educator Incentive Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 227 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 227 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2022-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 25-7-3 -Engelking |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |