ID S1279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to provide a framework for school district superintendent evaluations and to provide for district-specific criteria on the evaluations.
Title
Amends existing law to provide a framework for school district superintendent evaluations and to provide for district-specific criteria on the evaluations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-17 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2020-02-17 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |