ID S1262 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to authorize the imposition of a monetary penalty as an alternative to formal discipline against nurses who violate nursing statutes or rules.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize the imposition of a monetary penalty as an alternative to formal discipline against nurses who violate nursing statutes or rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2014-02-10 | Senate | FAILED -- 16-18-1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |