ID S1253 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CHILD SAFETY -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions requiring certain internet filters on computer devices used by children.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish provisions requiring certain internet filters on computer devices used by children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 23-12-0 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |