ID S1248 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEED AND PLANT CERTIFICATION -- Amends existing law to remove the requirement that the Idaho Agricultural Experiment Station use the administrative rules process to set standards and requirements for seed certification.
Title
Amends existing law to remove the requirement that the Idaho Agricultural Experiment Station use the administrative rules process to set standards and requirements for seed certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2020-03-06 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2020-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2020-02-18 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |