ID S1243 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 107 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 107 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BOARD OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding composition of the board.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding composition of the board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 107 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-11-5 |
2022-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-21 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |