ID S1236 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BINGO AND RAFFLES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding bingo and raffles.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding bingo and raffles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2024-01-29 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-01-26 | Senate | to House |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-2-1 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |