ID S1227 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Signed by Governor on 02/20/14 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Signed by Governor on 02/20/14 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to designate that portion of Interstate Highway I-84 located in Idaho as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.
Title
Adds to existing law to designate that portion of Interstate Highway I-84 located in Idaho as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 02/20/14 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 02/18/14 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-02-13 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-13 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-13 | House | PASSED -- 66-0-4 |
2014-02-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2014-02-05 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 30-4-1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |