ID S1223 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GROUND WATER DISTRICTS - Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the participation of nonmembers in ground water districts for mitigation purposes and to remove provisions regarding nonmembers deemed participants in districts and collection of a proportional share of costs.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the participation of nonmembers in ground water districts for mitigation purposes and to remove provisions regarding nonmembers deemed participants in districts and collection of a proportional share of costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on 03/16/16 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-11 | House | PASSED -- 64-0-6 |
2016-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2016-02-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-18 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |