ID S1220 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to require reimbursement to the state relating to the illegal killing, possession or waste of protected wildlife classified by the Fish and Game Commission, to clarify reimbursement provisions relating to wild chinook salmon and to provide for reimbursement for any other protected wildlife classified by the Fish and Game Commission in addition to those specifically identified.
Title
Amends existing law to require reimbursement to the state relating to the illegal killing, possession or waste of protected wildlife classified by the Fish and Game Commission, to clarify reimbursement provisions relating to wild chinook salmon and to provide for reimbursement for any other protected wildlife classified by the Fish and Game Commission in addition to those specifically identified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-31 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2014-01-31 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | to House |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-01-30 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |