ID S1217 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Session Law Chapter 4 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Session Law Chapter 4 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND GAME -- Amends existing law to authorize the director of the Idaho Department of Fish and Game to collect credit card fees.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize the director of the Idaho Department of Fish and Game to collect credit card fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 4 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-02-09 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-02-06 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-3-0 |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-26 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2018-01-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | to House |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |