ID S1215 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Signed by Governor on 02/24/16 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Signed by Governor on 02/24/16 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PESTICIDE MANAGEMENT COMMISSION - Repeals and amends existing law relating to the Commission on Pesticide Management; removing reference to the commission and providing for the transfer of certain moneys.
Title
Repeals and amends existing law relating to the Commission on Pesticide Management; removing reference to the commission and providing for the transfer of certain moneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 02/24/16 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on 02/19/16 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-02-18 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-02-15 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-15 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-15 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 15, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-05 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2016-02-05 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 31-0-4 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |