ID S1212 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 127 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 127 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS ACT - Amends, repeals and adds to existing law to create the Idaho Public Safety Communications Commission and charge it with the duties formerly held by the Idaho Emergency Communications Commission and the Statewide Interoperability Executive Council.
Title
Amends, repeals and adds to existing law to create the Idaho Public Safety Communications Commission and charge it with the duties formerly held by the Idaho Emergency Communications Commission and the Statewide Interoperability Executive Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 127 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on 03/17/16 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-14 | House | PASSED -- 59-6-5 |
2016-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2016-02-26 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Local Government |
2016-02-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-25 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |